judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8947
C-8947
08/09/1989
App Writ of Error
JOHN M. SHELTON III ET AL.
DOROTHY LaNELLE TAYLOR ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/24/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/09/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/20/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
11/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
08/30/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/30/1989No description available.
08/24/1989Reply to Response
08/09/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/20/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SMITH, JANIE TALMADGEPetitionerMr. Wayne P. Sturdivant
TAYLOR, SHELBY LYNNRespondentMr. Robert W. Johnson Jr.
TAYLOR, RICKY GENERespondentMr. Robert W. Johnson Jr.
BETTY JIM SMITH TRUSTPetitionerMr. Wayne P. Sturdivant
BOSTON, ELIZABETH SMITHPetitionerMr. Wayne P. Sturdivant
MCBRIDE, BETTY JIM SMITHPetitionerMr. Wayne P. Sturdivant
SMITH, JULIEPetitionerMr. Wayne P. Sturdivant
Court of Appeals Information:
07-88-00183-CV
Reversed & Remanded
___ Sw2d ___, 05-31-89
7th Court of Appeals
Honorable CHARLES L. REYNOLDS
Trial Court Information
47th District Court
Potter
Honorable David L. Gleason
70522-A