judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00197-CR
09-89-00197-CR
08/09/1989
ATTEMPTED MURDER
Davis, Ellis Carlyle
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/1990Mandate Issued
10/09/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
09/12/1990Petition for ReviewRefused
06/06/1990Petition for ReviewFiled in Higher Court
05/29/1990Petition for Review
03/28/1990Petition for ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/30/1990Brief Filed
01/30/1990Case ready to be set
01/18/1990Brief Filed
12/20/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/20/1989Transcript Filed
08/23/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
51209
99 years - TDC