judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00290-CR
08-89-00290-CR
08/09/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Herring, Harry Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/09/1991Mandate Issued
07/09/1991Shuck purged
07/09/1991Mandate Issued
06/11/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
06/11/1991Decision from Supreme Court or CCARefused
05/14/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/03/1990Petition for Discretionary Review
04/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/11/1990Motion postponed, to be heard later
03/28/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/09/1990Submitted
03/09/1990Submission
03/09/1990Submitted
01/31/1990Submission
12/20/1989Brief Filed
12/20/1989Case ready to be set
12/20/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Case ready to be set
12/06/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/22/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
10/25/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/29/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/20/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
09/07/1989Transcript Filed
08/28/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/09/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Gary Garrison
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. W. V. Dunnam, Jr.
Trial Court Information
244th District Court
Ector
Honorable Bill McCoy
C-16,766
35 yrs TDC, $10,fine &C.C.