judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00954-CV
05-89-00954-CV
08/09/1989
Other Personal Injury
Connor, Charlie R.
T. William Waltrip, M. D.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/1997Record RetentionRetain
05/31/1990Mandate Issued
05/31/1990Mandate Issued
04/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/14/1990Submission
02/14/1990Submitted
12/21/1989MattConv
10/16/1989MattConv
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
10/03/1989Brief Filed
10/03/1989Case ready to be set
10/03/1989Case ready to be set
09/08/1989Brief Filed
08/09/1989Transcript Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/03/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
88-11361-F