judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMMONS VS. SOUZA

Case Information: 38276
Short Caption:AMMONS VS. SOUZACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38549 , 39410 , 41835
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D228704Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Tracey K. Ammons--Global Express Money Order no. 156909195.
08/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13279
08/29/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn2[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-14655
09/25/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14688
09/25/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/12/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2001. 01-14688