judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAULA CHRISTIANSEN v. VICTORIA LEE CHRISTIANSEN

Case Heading (S-10-0252)
Case Number:S-10-0252Case Docketed On:11/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Niobrara CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:PAULA CHRISTIANSEN v. VICTORIA LEE CHRISTIANSEN
Full Title:PAULA CHRISTIANSEN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. VICTORIA LEE CHRISTIANSEN, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaula ChristiansenTracy L. Zubrod
Mary Elizabeth Galvan
AppelleeVictoria Lee ChristiansenLogan Lee Heth

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce
Opinion Number:2011 WY 90
Citation:253 P.3d 153

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
11/29/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/29/2010Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
11/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/01/2010Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Appellant's Amended Designation of the Record filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance for Mary Elizabeth Galvan as co-counsel for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
01/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance of Co-Counsel for Appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/31/2011Motion - Amicus - leave to participate (No admission pro hac vice pending)MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
02/03/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
02/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission of Daniel Blomberg Pro Hac ViceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2011Response/Objection - Other - to motion to file amicus curiae brief.Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's response in opposition to motion of amici curiae to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
02/23/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from Mr. Mason indicating that the Rule 11 affidavit was inadvertently omitted from the motion for admission pro hac vice. It will be attached to the hard copies.EventPhone CallFinal
02/23/2011Order - Denying Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief (and denying admission pro hac vice as moot)OrderDenyFinal
02/23/2011Order - Show Cause Why This Appeal Should not be Dismissed Due to Appellant's Failure to Serve the "Brief of Appellant" on the Attorney General of the State of WyomingOrderShow causeFinal
02/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Admission of David Austin Robert Nimocks Pro Hac ViceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/08/2011Brief - Failure to file - appelleeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
03/18/2011Response/Objection - Show cause orderResponse/ObjectionShow cause orderFinal
03/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Why This Appeal Should Not be Dismissed due to Appellant's Failure to Serve "Brief of Appellant" on the Attorney General of the State of WyomingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2011Order - Other - Discharging Order to Show Cause Why This Appeal Should Not Be DismissedOrderOtherFinal
03/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/04/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/19/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/29/2011Motion - Amicus - leave to participate - Renewed Motion of Amici Curiae Speaker Edward Buchanan, et al., Affirmation of the District Court's Dismissal of Appellant's Complaint for Divorce. (Proposed brief removed from motion, will be filed and distributed in the normal course if accepted by Court.)MotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
04/29/2011Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Renewed Motion for Admission of David Austin Robert Nimocks and Daniel Blomberg, pro hac vice to serve as counsel for Amici Curiae Speaker Edward Buchanan, et al.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/04/2011Order - Amicus - deny participation - order denying renewed motion for leave to file amici curiae brief.OrderAmicus - deny participationFinal
06/06/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/22/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/23/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal