judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEITH TOWNSEND V. PEPCO HOLDINGS, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1457
Short Caption:KEITH TOWNSEND V. PEPCO HOLDINGS, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2877-09Filed Date:11/12/2010

Opening Event Date:11/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/20/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKeith Townsend N
Marc J. Smith NN
AppelleePepco Holdings, Inc.N
Connie N. Bertram NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/01/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 12, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
02/03/2011RECORD INDEX
02/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (88-pgs/maddox 9/3/10 proc)w/cd (*Requested by counsel for appellee Connie Betram, Esquire)
03/23/2011STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL
03/29/2011 On consideration of the stipulation of dismissal filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed with prejudice with the parties to bear their own costs and fees. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b)(2). (ETW) elp
03/29/2011DISMISSED
04/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED