Case Information: 01-BG-0179 | |||
Short Caption: | SUMANTO BASU V. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 02/12/2001 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 02/12/2001 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Petitioner | Sumanto Basu | N |
| |||||||||
Respondent | D.C. Committee on Admissions | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
02/12/2001 | PETITION FOR REVIEW | |||
02/12/2001 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE | |||
02/16/2001 | ORDER On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that this matter is referred to the Committee on Admissions for its recommendation as to whether the relief sought by the petitioner should be afforded by this court. (GP) | |||
03/06/2001 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF COMM. ON ADMISSIONS | |||
03/14/2001 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
03/14/2001 | GRANTED On consideration of the petition for review, and the recommendation of the Committee on Admissions thereto, it is ORDERED that the petition is granted and the applicant is directed to file a current application with the Committee on Admissions in conformance with Rule 46 (c)(4) within 30 days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall apply only as a Special Legal Consultant with respect to matters of Indian Law. (FA, RD, KG) | |||
04/17/2001 | PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for an extension of time (consent). | |||
04/25/2001 | ORDER On consideration of the petitioner's consent motion for an extension of time to file a current application to be licensed as a Special Legal Consultant in Indian Law, with the Committee on Admissions in conformance with Rule 46 (c)(4) on or before June 16, 2001, it is ORDERED that the petitioner's motion is granted and the petitioner is directed to file a current application with the Committee on Admissions in conformance with Rule 46 (c)(4) on or before June 16, 2001. (By FA, RD, KG) |