judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8518
A-8518
06/01/1961
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
SHERMAN D. GEORGE
AMERICAN OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/28/1962Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/08/1962Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/17/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/23/1961Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent
10/23/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
09/25/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/10/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
07/10/1961Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
07/10/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/30/1963Order from Lower Court filed
01/30/1963Opinion issued
01/22/1963Motion to lift stay filed
01/03/1963Letter Filed
12/14/1962Order from Lower Court filed
11/14/1962Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
08/11/1962Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
08/08/1962Order from Lower Court filed
08/07/1962Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
06/12/1962Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
05/31/1962Letter Filed
05/28/1962Response to Motion filed
05/28/1962Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/02/1962Response to Motion filed
02/08/1962Brief in Support of Petition
01/17/1962Motion for Rehearing
01/03/1962Opinion issued
10/23/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/23/1961Response to Petition
09/25/1961Brief in Support of Petition
07/18/1961Bond
07/10/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
07/10/1961Exhibits in case/cause filed
07/10/1961Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedFiling granted
07/10/1961motion for leave to file petitionFiling granted
07/07/1961Order from Lower Court filed
06/01/1961Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sherman D. GeorgePetitioner
American Oil CompanyRespondent
Clark, Thomas, Harris, Denius and WintersAmicus Curiae
Vinson, Elkins, Weems and SearlsAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information