judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BITTENCOURT VS. MYERS

Case Information: 38277
Short Caption:BITTENCOURT VS. MYERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D257987Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro, Ltd.--check no. 1606.
08/06/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13284
08/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14473
08/27/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 16, 2001 and June 21, 2001. To Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 01-14474
10/22/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 16, 2001 and June 21, 2001. Court Reporter: Deborah Casper. 01-17794
01/22/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. 02-01484
01/22/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule). 02-01485
03/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny appellant's motion to suspend the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an opening brief and appendix. Since respondent is proceeding in proper person in this matter, upon receipt of the opening brief and appendix, this matter shall stant submitted upon the record and the opening brief and appendix. 02-04569
04/15/2002MotionFiled Motion. Renewed Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. 02-06700
05/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. We deny appellant's renewed motion to suspend the briefing schedule. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file the opening brief and appendix. Absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances, no extensions shall be granted for filing the opening brief. 02-08598
06/28/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-11190
09/17/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion, and we " . . . dismiss this appeal." The parties shall bear their own costs and fees. SNP/CLK 02-16161
09/17/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.