judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BARBARA A. WOODS V. NORMA L. WOODS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1458
Short Caption:BARBARA A. WOODS V. NORMA L. WOODS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR5781-09Filed Date:11/17/2010

Opening Event Date:11/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBarbara A. Woods YPro SeN
AppelleeNorma L. Woods N
AppelleeEagle TitleN
Catherine A. HanrahanNY
AppelleeAdrian Merceron N
David H. CoxNY
James N. MarkelsNY
AppelleeJanice Alers-Garcia N
David H. CoxNY
James N. MarkelsNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/02/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 17, 2010, and it appea ring that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/06/2010RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 8/24/09, 8/28/09, 9/18/09, 11/20/09, 2/12/10, 7/21/10 & 10/20/10) (elp)
03/03/2011LETTER from Atty Jackson that he does not represent any of the parties. *(PER COURTVIEW Atty Jackson was identified as representing appellee Norma Wood in the trial court but has sinced been removed as of 3/3/11) (elp)
03/22/2011RECEIVED - aple's joint motion for summary affirmance (returned, no signatures on pleading)
03/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (Joint)
03/25/2011TMC - appellees' joint motion for summary affirmance - motion for summary affirmance (NORMA) - oppositions
04/04/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (Norma L. Woods)
04/04/2011APPELLANT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION for 60 days and to find an attorney
04/12/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that APPELLANT'S RESPONSE,if any, to appellees' motions for summary affirmance shall be filed NO LATER THAN MAY 6, 2011. (CASTILLO) LW
04/14/2011RECEIVED - aple's oppo to aplt's motion for an enlargement of time to file reponse to motion for summary affirmance.
04/18/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to aple's motion for summary judgment 60 days to find an attorney
05/04/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED TO THE EXTENT that APPELLANT'S RESPONSE, if any, to appellees' motions for summary affirmance shall be filed NO LATER THAN MAY 16, 2011. NO FURTHER REQUESTS for extensions of time will be granted...(BY: ETW) LW
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION -to aple's motion for summary affirmance to Norma Luinell Wood
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to motion for summary affirmance to Eagle Title, Adrian Merceron & Janice Aler-Garcia
05/26/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY to aplt's opposition to Summary Affirmance.
06/02/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE*****
06/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is AFFIRMED. (RZTHNB)JL
06/24/2011MANDATE ISSUED