judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8425
A-8425
05/25/1961
Application for Writ of Error
CLARENCE WISE
M. E. ANDERSON AND ANDERSON OIL AND GAS COMPANY OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/27/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/19/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/05/1962Post submission brief filedPetitioner
09/18/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1961Appendix FiledPetitioner
05/25/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/19/1962Response to Motion filed
07/27/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/18/1962Opinion issued
02/19/1962Response to Brief filed
02/05/1962Post submission brief filed
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
09/18/1961Response to Petition
05/25/1961Appendix Filed
05/25/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/25/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Clarence WisePetitioner
M. E. Anderson and Anderson Oil and Gas Company of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information