judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8455
A-8455
06/12/1961
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. L. L. DAVIS
EAST TEXAS SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF TYLER, TEXAS, RITTIA LEE VENABLE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/15/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/14/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/27/1961Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/25/1961Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/26/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/22/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/12/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/23/1962Response to Motion filed
03/23/1962Response to Motion filed
03/15/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/15/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/14/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/02/1962Letter Filed
02/28/1962Opinion issued
11/08/1961Miscellaneous letter
10/27/1961Brief on the Merits
09/29/1961Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarksFiling granted
09/25/1961Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
07/26/1961Document received (See Remarks)
06/26/1961Response to Petition
06/22/1961Response to Petition
06/12/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/12/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rittia Lee VenableRespondent
East Texas Savings and Loan Association of Tyler, TexasRespondent
Mrs. L. L. DavisPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information