judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8422
A-8422
05/24/1961
Application for Writ of Error
M. M. HUBBARD, INC.
JOHN H. GEHRING, JOHN STRAKOS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/12/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/11/1962Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/18/1962Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/02/1962Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/15/1962Post submission brief filedPetitioner
03/07/1962Brief on the MeritsRespondent
03/07/1962Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/30/1961Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/30/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
08/21/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/29/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/24/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/24/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/03/1962Opinion issued
09/20/1962Response to Motion filed
09/14/1962Response to Motion filed
07/17/1962Response to Motion filed
07/12/1962Motion for Rehearing
07/11/1962Motion for Rehearing
06/27/1962Dissenting opinion issued.
06/27/1962Opinion issued
04/18/1962Response to Brief filed
04/02/1962Response to Brief filed
03/15/1962Post submission brief filed
03/07/1962Brief on the Merits
03/07/1962Brief on the Merits
02/07/1962Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1962Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1962Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1962Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1962Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1962Document received (See Remarks)
02/07/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/30/1961Reply to Response
08/30/1961Response to Petition
08/21/1961Response to Petition
06/29/1961Brief in Support of Petition
05/24/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/24/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/24/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John StrakosRespondent
M. M. Hubbard, Inc.Petitioner
John H. GehringRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information