judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8463
A-8463
06/14/1961
Application for Writ of Error
MOLLIE FOSTER, ET AL.
L-M-S DEVOLPMENT COMPANY, MERCANTILE SECURITY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND H. EDWARD SMITH, MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS, TRUSTEE, L-M-S DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/14/1961Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/03/1961Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/07/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/29/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/14/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/13/1961Response to Motion filed
08/14/1961Brief in Support of Petition
08/03/1961Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/07/1961Response to Petition
06/29/1961Response to Petition
06/14/1961Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/14/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
L-M-S Development Company, et al.Respondent
L-M-S Devolpment Company, Mercantile Security Life Insurance Company and H. Edward SmithRespondent
Mollie Foster, et al.Petitioner
Mercantile National Bank of Dallas, TrusteeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information