judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-8465
A-8465
06/15/1961
Application for Writ of Error
VALMONT PLANTATIONS, ET AL., R. F. BREEDEN, ET AL., W. L. PICKENS, TRUSTEE, ET AL., EVERETT BELL, ET AL., EVERETT BELL, ET AL., AND W. L. PICKENS, ET AL., EDWARD ROOS, ET AL.
STATE BOARD OF WATER ENGINEERS AND THE STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/01/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/01/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/28/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/02/1962Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
01/22/1962Response to Brief filedPetitioner
01/15/1962Post submission brief filedRespondent
12/28/1961Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/25/1961Response to PetitionRespondent
06/15/1961Appendix FiledPetitioner
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/24/1965Letter Filed
04/22/1965Letter Filed
04/04/1963Order from Lower Court filed
03/01/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/01/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/28/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/14/1962Dissenting opinion issued.
02/14/1962Opinion issued
02/02/1962Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
01/23/1962Motion for leave to file brief
01/22/1962Response to Brief filed
01/15/1962Post submission brief filed
12/28/1961Brief on the Merits
12/12/1961Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarksFiling granted
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
11/29/1961Document received (See Remarks)
07/25/1961Response to Petition
06/16/1961Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
06/15/1961Appendix Filed
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/15/1961Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/15/1961Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edward Roos, et al.Petitioner
Everett Bell, et al.Petitioner
J. H. Starley, District Judge of the 143rd Judicial District of TexasJudge
W. L. Pickens, Trustee, et al.Petitioner
R. F. Breeden, et al.Petitioner
State of Texas, et al.Respondent
Valmont Plantations, et al.Petitioner
Cities of Donna, Edcouch, Edinburg, Elsa, Harlingen, La Villa, Mercedes, Raymonville andWeslacoAmicus Curiae
State Board of Water Engineers and the State of TexasRespondent
Everett Bell, et al., and W. L. Pickens, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information