judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOMES VS. GOMES

Case Information: 33522
Short Caption:GOMES VS. GOMESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38940 , 45399
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D197507Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/02/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00529
01/26/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-00546
03/02/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 4. Mailed on: 2/24/99. 99-01454
03/02/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/29/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. (Leavitt Law Firm).
09/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order directing Response. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file points and authorities demonstrating why the district court's order should not be reversed. 00-15951
10/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for an Extension to Respond to the Court's Order. 00-17405
10/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until November 13, 2000, to file his response. 00-18529
11/13/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Court's Order filed September 11, 2000. 00-19787
11/13/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-19788
02/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. " . . . reverse the district court's order denying Gail's motion to set aside the stipulated property settlement and granting attorney fees to Henry, and we remand this matter to the district court for further proceedings in accordance with this order." fn6[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We deny Henry's motion to supplement the record, filed on November 13, 2000. ] NNP99B-RR/CY/DA 01-02427
03/06/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 4 this day. 01-02573
03/06/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/07/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Emergency Motion for Relief pursuant to N.R.A.P. 27(a).
03/22/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 14, 2001. 01-02573
07/17/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Motion for Relief Pursuant to 27(a) to Notice the Nevada Supreme Court of Severe Convolutions with Case No. 33522, which was on Appeal and the Order of Reversal and Remand filed February 6, 2001, by the Nevada Supreme Court.
08/10/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, Motion for Relief Pursuant to 27(a) to Notice the Nevada Supreme Court of Severe Convolutions with Case No. 33522, which was on Appeal and the Order of Reversal and Remand filed February 6, 2001, by the Nevada Supreme Court.