Case Heading (S-09-0129) | |||||
Case Number: | S-09-0129 | Case Docketed On: | 07/01/2009 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903 | ||
Short Title: | MAURICE CAROL NOLLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | MAURICE CAROL NOLLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Maurice Carol Noller | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Jenny Lynn Craig |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Sentencing |
Opinion Number: | 2010 WY 30 |
Citation: | 226 P.3d 867 (Wyo. 2010) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
07/01/2009 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
07/01/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
07/01/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/18/2009 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
08/18/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/08/2009 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
09/09/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/10/2009 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
09/29/2009 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
09/29/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/02/2009 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential File; Volume III, Transcripts. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/03/2009 | Event - Expedited Assignment | Event | Brief Only Assignment | Final | |
03/18/2010 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court. Chief Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinion. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/05/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/05/2010 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/05/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/05/2010 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/09/2010 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/8/2010. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |