judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRUCE MAGBIE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0073
Short Caption:BRUCE MAGBIE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2159-10Filed Date:01/18/2011

Opening Event Date:01/18/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/13/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBruce Magbie Y
Dennis M. HartNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/18/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Dennis Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/02/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Dennis Hart, Esquire
03/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
03/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (70pgs/M. Johnson) 12/9/10 proc.
03/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (114pgs/M. Johnson) 12/10/10 proc. w/CD
03/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/23/2011RECORD INDEX
03/23/2011RECORD COPIES
03/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
05/12/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 3, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/03/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) with brief included (dwm) Held in Abeyance
06/08/2011 ORDERED that the APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN JULY 1, 2011 file a response showing any reason why counsel's motion should not be granted and the conviction or judgment affirmed...SEE HARDCOPY It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of court-appointed counsel to withdraw is HELD IN ABEYANCE... (BY: ETW)
06/08/2011TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
09/20/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
09/20/2011FiledAffirmed
10/13/2011FiledMandate