judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00850-CV
05-94-00850-CV
05/31/1994
Contract
Franks, Gene & Luanne Barner Franks, d/b/a Kel's
Steven C. Howard
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/09/2015Order enteredDestroy
08/25/2015Letter issued by the court
07/01/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
05/19/1995Letter Filed
05/17/1995Case stored
05/17/1995Mandate Issued
05/17/1995Mandate Issued
05/02/1995Mandate due to be issued
03/22/1995Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/21/1995Motion for Leave to File
03/03/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/21/1995Response to Motion
02/10/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/31/1995Motion for Leave to File
01/31/1995Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/26/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/26/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/04/1995Submission
01/04/1995Submitted
01/04/1995Submission
01/04/1995Submitted
12/05/1994MattConv
11/07/1994Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant
10/24/1994MattConv
08/08/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
07/27/1994Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/25/1994Brief Filed
07/25/1994Case ready to be set
07/25/1994Case ready to be set
07/22/1994Mot Ext Time File Strans
07/15/1994Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Denied
07/08/1994Mot Ext Time File Strans
07/06/1994Letter Sent by the Court
06/30/1994Brief Filed
06/13/1994MattConv
05/31/1994Transcript Filed
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/02/1994Appeal Bond Filed
02/01/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/09/2015Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Charles A. Stokes
CC93-9552-E