judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00149-CV
12-94-00149-CV
05/31/1994
Mandamus
Morris, David
Gohmert, Hon. Louis, Judge, 7th Judicial District, Smith County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
07/06/1994Case stored
06/28/1994
06/13/1994Disposition of MotionOverruled
06/13/1994Motion for Leave to File
06/13/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the disposition of a process
05/31/1994No Description Available.
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/2006Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserRespondentJudge Gohmert Jr.
Singer Warehouse SalesRespondentSinger Corporation
Morris, DavidRelatorDavid Morris
Compton, JimRespondent
Singer Corp.Respondent
Trial Court Information
7th District Court
Smith
Honorable Sam B. Bournias
94-355-A