judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00292-CR
04-94-00292-CR
05/31/1994
Robbery
Esparza, Mario Alberto
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2016Internal memo
04/20/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/20/1995Mandate received by the trial court
04/13/1995Mandate Issued
04/13/1995Mandate Issued
02/15/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/15/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1995Submitted
01/25/1995Submission
01/25/1995Submitted
12/21/1994Submission
12/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/18/1994Brief Filed
11/18/1994Case ready to be set
11/18/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
11/18/1994Case ready to be set
11/17/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/15/1994Brief Filed
07/14/1994No Description Available.
07/14/1994No Description Available.
07/13/1994No Description Available.
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/25/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
05/16/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/08/2018Case StoredCase archived
06/06/2016Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Esparza, Mario AlbertoCriminal - AppellantTom M. Torkildson
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMonica Z. Notzon
Trial Court Information
49th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Manuel R. Flores
K93-830
60 Years