judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00238-CR
13-94-00238-CR
05/31/1994
DWI
Atkinson, Jose Silva
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/1996Letter filed
01/31/1995Mandate Issued
12/15/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/27/1994Bar fees paid
10/27/1994Green card in
10/25/1994Bar fees paid
10/21/199410 day letter sent
10/19/1994Submitted
10/19/1994Submission
09/06/1994Letter sent
08/30/1994Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
08/18/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/08/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/04/1994Submission
07/13/1994Brief Filed
07/13/1994Case ready to be set
07/13/1994No oral argument requested
07/11/1994Transcript Filed
07/06/1994Statement of Facts Filed
07/06/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
07/06/1994Statement of Facts Received
05/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/31/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Luis V. Saenz
Atkinson, Jose SilvaAppellantHon. Peter Gilman
Trial Court Information
107th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Benjamin Euresti
93-CR-1760-A
5 yrs TDCJ-ID/Prob 5 yrs