judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00121-CV
02-94-00121-CV
05/31/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Truck Insurance Exchange
Musick, Calvin N.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/12/1996Mandate Issued
12/22/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/16/1995Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/25/1995Writ Filed
07/27/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/23/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/08/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
12/07/1994Submitted
12/07/1994Submission
11/17/1994Order Entered
10/06/1994Brief Filed
10/06/1994Case ready to be set
08/12/1994Amended Brief Filed
08/09/1994Letter
08/02/1994Brief Filed
06/14/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/10/1994No Description Available.
05/31/1994No Description Available.
05/31/1994No Description Available.
05/31/1994Submission
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Truck Insurance ExchangeAppellantMichael J. Catania
Musick, Calvin N.AppelleeRickey J. Brantley
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ken Curry
153-140460-92