judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00298-CR
04-94-00298-CR
05/31/1994
All Misdemeanors
Texas, The State of
Warren, Vernon
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/24/2016Internal memo
04/16/1996Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
10/10/1995Mandate received by the trial court
10/06/1995Mandate Issued
10/06/1995Mandate Issued
08/16/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
08/16/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
11/02/1994Submitted
11/02/1994Submission
11/02/1994Submitted
10/03/1994Submission
07/27/1994Case ready to be set
07/27/1994Order Entered
07/27/1994Case ready to be set
07/08/1994Brief Filed
07/08/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
07/08/1994Response to Motion Filed
06/28/1994Response to Motion Filed
06/17/1994Brief Filed
06/17/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
06/07/1994Order Entered
05/31/1994No Description Available.
05/31/1994No Description Available.
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/04/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/26/1994Order Entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/03/2018Case StoredCase archived
10/06/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasAlton Lynn Ellison
Warren, VernonCriminal - AppellantDonna S. Rayes
Trial Court Information
81st Judicial District Court
Atascosa
Honorable James E. Barlow
93-09-0231-CRA
Motion to Quash