judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00244-CR
02-94-00244-CR
05/31/1994
Robbery
Crosby, Andre Derrell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/1995Mandate Issued
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/25/1995Submitted
04/25/1995Submission
02/21/1995Brief Filed
02/21/1995Case ready to be set
01/27/1995Letter
01/17/1995Brief Filed
01/05/1995Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1995No Description Available.
12/29/1994Response Filed
12/23/1994Motion Filed
12/01/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/01/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
06/22/1994Submission
06/20/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
05/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/19/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Crosby, Andre DerrellCriminal - AppellantLouis E. Sturns
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Clifford Davis
0487095A
LIFE IDTDCJ