judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00846-CV
05-94-00846-CV
05/31/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Barnett, Otis, Clotyne Barnett & Robert Berry
Philip Mitchell, d/b/a Mitchell Remodeling Co, Raymond
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/09/2015Order enteredDestroy
08/25/2015Letter issued by the court
07/01/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
08/27/1996Case stored
08/27/1996Mandate Issued
08/27/1996Mandate Issued
05/25/1996Mandate due to be issued
03/26/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/22/1996Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/1996Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1996MattConv
02/15/1996Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
02/15/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/15/1996Motion for Rehearing Tendered
02/13/1996MattConv
02/06/1996Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/1996Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
01/19/1996Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
01/16/1996MattConv
01/11/1996Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1995Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
12/22/1995MattConv
12/20/1995Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1995Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
11/14/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/14/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/11/1995Submission
10/11/1995Submitted
10/11/1995Submission
10/11/1995Submitted
09/12/1995MattConv
09/01/1995MattConv
02/14/1995Case ready to be set
02/14/1995MattConv
02/14/1995Case ready to be set
02/08/1995Letter Filed
02/08/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/20/1995Brief Filed
01/18/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/03/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/03/1995Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/1994Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1994Motion to Substitute Attorney
11/21/1994MattConv
11/18/1994Motion to Withdraw Attorney
11/16/1994Collection letter on Filing Fee
11/15/1994Letter Sent by the Court
10/31/1994Letter Filed
10/26/1994Notice to appellant that brief is late
08/26/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
08/24/1994Mot Ext Time File Strans DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/12/1994Jurisdictional Brief Filed
08/12/1994Response to Motion
08/02/1994Mot Ext Time File Strans
08/02/1994Jurisdictional Brief Filed
07/26/1994Motion to File DisposedOtherwise Disposed
07/25/1994Motion for Leave to File
07/14/1994Letter Sent by the Court
06/27/1994Motion for Mediation
06/23/1994Transcript Filed
06/16/1994Exhibits Filed
06/16/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/24/1994Appeal Bond Filed
02/23/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/09/2015Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable David C. Godbey
91-14609-L