judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REYGERS VS. CURTIS

Case Information: 33521
Short Caption:REYGERS VS. CURTISCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33755
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A357448Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Claiborne, HarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mcdonald firm-check no. 4654.
12/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00528
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Harry Claiborne. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00226
04/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-02472
04/02/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Stipulation for Dismissal of Appeal of Order Granting Defendants John and Sylvia Curtis' Motion for Summary Judgment. 99-02473
04/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. 99-02717
04/09/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.