Case: A-4625
A-4625
04/09/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. M. M. G. MOODY
W. L. MOODY, III
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/17/1954 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
09/22/1954 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
04/09/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/19/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/17/1954 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
11/03/1954 | Submission reset | | ||
09/22/1954 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
06/10/1954 | Miscellaneous Motion | Filing granted | | |
05/26/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/09/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
04/09/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mrs. M. M. G. Moody | Petitioner | |
W. L. Moody, III | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information