judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00119-CV
02-94-00119-CV
05/31/1994
Mandamus
Benz, Byron R.
Purcell, Hon. Graham, Visiting Judge, 235th District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/13/1994Case stored
07/13/1994Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/16/1994Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/02/1994Motion DisposedOverruled
06/02/1994Opinion issuedOverruled
05/31/1994Motion to File
05/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kemper, Paula (Benz)Appellee
Benz, Byron R.Appellant
Kemper, paula (Wthdrew 5-26-91)Appellee
Trial Court Information
235th District Court
Cooke
92-096