judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENNIS POITRA, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0085)
Case Number:S-11-0085Case Docketed On:04/08/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DENNIS POITRA, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DENNIS POITRA, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDennis Poitra Jr.Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Venue
Opinion Number:2012 WY 58
Citation:275 P.3d 478

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/08/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/20/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
04/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas for appellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/03/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina Olson, Appellate Counsel, PDP.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Diane M. Lozano and Tina N. Olson allowed to withdraw. Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas is substituted as counsel for appellant.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
05/23/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's First Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2011Order - Grant - extension of time (Appellant requested due date falling on a Sunday, order makes brief due on first business day, Monday)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/06/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/02/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's third motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/08/2011Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/26/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/14/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/09/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Elisabeth Trefonas for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/03/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Daraie for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/12/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas for appellant; Justin A. Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/12/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/12/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/30/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/30/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/02/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 5/1/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal