judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITTAKER (LARRY) VS. STATE, NV DEPT. OF PRISONS C/W 34037

Case Information: 33542
Short Caption:WHITTAKER (LARRY) VS. STATE, NV DEPT. OF PRISONS C/W 34037Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:33542*, 34037
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC9811024Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/04/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00012
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33542, 33557. 99-00309
03/16/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 3/11/99. 99-01902
03/16/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 33518, 33575. 00-12158
08/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13808
08/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/07/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 17, 2000. 00-13808