judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEFFREY N. MARKOWICZ V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CV-0092
Short Caption:JEFFREY N. MARKOWICZ V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4463-10Filed Date:01/28/2011

Opening Event Date:01/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/02/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJeffrey N. MarkowiczNPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/07/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 28, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
02/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 9/17/10 & 7/2/10) (elp)
04/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (41-pgs/9/17/10 proc.)
04/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (43-pgs/tape 7/2/10 proc)w/cd
04/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
05/23/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 22, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 8/1/11
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before August 1, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
07/27/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal with prejudice (Joint) (Appellant Markowicz, Appellee District of Columbia)Granted
08/05/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal with prejudice (Joint) (Appellant Markowicz, Appellee District of Columbia
08/05/2011FiledDismissed
09/02/2011FiledMandate