judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK ORCHARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-11-0084)
Case Number:S-11-0084Case Docketed On:04/07/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:MARK ORCHARD v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:MARK ORCHARD, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Defendant)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark OrchardR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Michael Thomas Kahler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2011 WY 145
Citation:262 P.3d 197

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/07/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/07/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/20/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Mark OrchardEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, The State of Wyoming Department of Transportation and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/26/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/04/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/08/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/08/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/09/2011ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal