judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0599-94
PD-0599-94
05/31/1994
PDR Case Type
RAMIREZ, JOE MIGUEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/31/1994RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1994FINAL DISPRefused
10/07/1994FINAL DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
07/05/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
05/31/1994PDR FILED
05/31/1994PDR FILED
05/31/1994PDR FILED
05/31/1994PDR FILED
05/31/1994RESPONSE FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
RAMIREZ, JOE MIGUELApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)David Guinn
STATE OF TEXASStateAlbert Valadez
Robert A. Huttash
Court of Appeals Information:
08-91-00289-CR
REV & REM 3-30-94
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
83rd District Court
Pecos
Honorable Alex R. Gonzalez
2003