judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00541-CV
14-94-00541-CV
05/29/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Plaza Court, Ltd., Et Al
Hon. David West, Judge 269th District Court
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/08/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/06/1994Opinion issuedGRANTED
06/06/1994Opinion issuedGRANTED
06/03/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/01/1994Memorandum of Authorities
06/01/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/01/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
06/01/1994Submitted
06/01/1994Submission
06/01/1994Submitted
05/31/1994Response to Reply Brief FILED
05/29/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESGRANTED
05/29/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
05/29/1994Petition for writ of mandamus FILED-REL,RES
05/29/1994Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
05/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 269th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentAlvin L. Zimmerman
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentRichard T. Howell, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorScott Rothenberg
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJames C. Moore
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris