judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARQUETTE MARVIN JORDAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0075
Short Caption:MARQUETTE MARVIN JORDAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD18012-10Filed Date:01/21/2011

Opening Event Date:01/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/06/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
James A. PetkunNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/21/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/08/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Chantal Jean-Baptiste, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/08/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Chantal Jean-Baptiste, Esquire
02/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (110pgs/Van Bremen) 1/12/11 proc.
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (9pgs/Tape) 1/12/11 Part II
08/01/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (68pgs/Van Bremen) 1/13/11 proc. w/CD
08/01/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/10/2011FiledRecord Index
08/10/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/18/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte that the lodged appellant's brief and limited appendix are filed and directing the appellee's brief within 30 days from the date of this order
08/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/18/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
09/20/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
09/26/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/15/2011FiledAffirmed
12/23/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/06/2012FiledMandate