judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MANUEL MASIAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0131)
Case Number:S-09-0131Case Docketed On:07/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MANUEL MASIAS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MANUEL MASIAS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantManuel MasiasDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 81
Citation:233 P.3d 944

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/03/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Motion for removal of exhibits filed in District Court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/07/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/11/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/05/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/17/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume III, Transcripts; Volumes IV-V, Exhibits; Volume VI, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order Affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/13/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal