judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUSHKIN VS. FISHER

Case Information: 33524
Short Caption:BUSHKIN VS. FISHERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35535
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A301558Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Galatz, NeilSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley firm-check no. 68816.
12/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00534
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Neil Galatz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00222
03/25/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-02168
04/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the time deadlines for requesting and preparing transcripts and briefing shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review of this appeal and further order of this court. 99-02449
04/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 99-03081
05/19/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-04113
08/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-07138
08/31/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-08172
08/31/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/23/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 13, 1999. 99-08172
12/13/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address Pursuant to SCR 79(3) (Jeffrey Albregts). 02-21380