judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOUSE (MARIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33523
Short Caption:HOUSE (MARIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140225Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/21/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/28/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00530
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33262, 33289, 33318, 33402, 33463, 33464, 33465, 33479, 33480, 33481, 33523. 99-00325
05/21/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 99-04196
05/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09860
07/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10394
07/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 18, 2001. 01-10394