judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LIZ V. FRETES ZARATE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0074
Short Caption:LIZ V. FRETES ZARATE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1909-10Filed Date:01/19/2011

Opening Event Date:01/19/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/23/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus CuriaeAmerican Civil Liberties Union American Civil Liberties Union of the Nation's CapitalN
Arthur B. SpitzerNY
AppellantLiz V. Fretes-Zarate Y
Enid HinkesYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz NN
Peter C. LallasYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/19/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/02/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Enid Hinkes, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/02/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Enid Hinkes, Esquire
02/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (83pgs/Coney) 1/10/11 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (pg. 84 - pg. 176) 1/11/11 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (pg. 177 - pg. 190) 1/12/11 proc. w/CD
04/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/21/2011RECORD INDEX
04/21/2011RECORD COPIES
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/23/11 no oppo
06/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. (By: JAC)
07/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/05/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to 8/12/11.
08/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/11/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/13/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/13/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/08/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/16/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged reply brief
12/16/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/23/2011FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
01/26/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
02/09/2012FiledMemorandum from appellee stating Peter Lallas will argue the case in place of Adam Schwartz (Appellee)
02/23/2012FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Easterly, Pryor
03/29/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, Easterly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is affirmed)
04/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. (Appellant)Granted
04/12/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 6/11/12.
06/08/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
06/12/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Other (Amicus Curiae)Granted
07/03/2012FiledORDERED that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
07/16/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellee)
04/12/2013FiledOrder Granting Amicus Curiae's motion for leave and the lodged brief of anicus curiae is filed.
04/12/2013FiledBrief (Amicus Curiae)
04/12/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
05/06/2013FiledMotion to stay the mandate; or in the alternative to recall the mandate (Appellant)Denied
05/10/2013FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion to stay mandate.
05/23/2013FiledMandate