judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEIL DRUMMOND SAUNDERS v. CHERYL ANN SAUNDERS

Case Heading (S-09-0130)
Case Number:S-09-0130Case Docketed On:07/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:NEIL DRUMMOND SAUNDERS v. CHERYL ANN SAUNDERS
Full Title:NEIL DRUMMOND SAUNDERS, Petitioner, v. CHERYL ANN SAUNDERS, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerNeil Drummond SaundersJessica Rutzick
RespondentCheryl Ann SaundersRichard J. Mulligan
Heather Noble

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/02/2009Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
07/08/2009Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
07/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent's opposition to petition for writ of review.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Errata to response/objection to petition.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
07/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent's notice of errataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/21/2009Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
07/21/2009Event - Case closed (sealed affidavit shredded)EventCase closedFinal