judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0602-94
PD-0602-94
05/31/1994
PDR Case Type
FELMET, NORMAN ALLEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1994FINAL DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
07/05/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
05/31/1994PDR FILED
05/31/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJack Skeen Jr
FELMET, NORMAN ALLENApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Thomas A. Dunn
Court of Appeals Information:
12-91-00063-CR
AFF 4-25-94
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable Joe Tunnell
1-90-751