judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARQUEZ VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 33557
Short Caption:MARQUEZ VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - WM9811022Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/18/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-00047
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 33542, 33557. 99-00310
03/18/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 3/16/99. 99-01984
03/18/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-08897
06/21/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10594
06/21/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/30/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 26, 2000. 00-10594