judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CYNTHIA FAYARD and GALEFORCE, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. THE DESIGN COMMITTEE OF THE HOMESTEAD SUBDIVISION, 2nd AND 3rd FILINGS, a Wyoming Unincorporated Association; SANDRA DAY; HORTON SPITZER; and GARY FINKEL, each as an individual and as a member of the Design Committee of the Homestead Subdivision, 2nd and 3rd Filings

Case Heading (S-09-0145)
Case Number:S-09-0145Case Docketed On:07/29/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:CYNTHIA FAYARD and GALEFORCE, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. THE DESIGN COMMITTEE OF THE HOMESTEAD SUBDIVISION, 2nd AND 3rd FILINGS, a Wyoming Unincorporated Association; SANDRA DAY; HORTON SPITZER; and GARY FINKEL, each as an individual and as a member of the Design Committee of the Homestead Subdivision, 2nd and 3rd Filings
Full Title:CYNTHIA FAYARD and GALEFORCE, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. THE DESIGN COMMITTEE OF THE HOMESTEAD SUBDIVISION, 2nd AND 3rd FILINGS, a Wyoming Unincorporated Association; SANDRA DAY; HORTON SPITZER; and GARY FINKEL, each as an individual and as a member of the Design Committee of the Homestead Subdivision, 2nd and 3rd Filings, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCynthia FayardPaula Ann Fleck
Susan Louise Combs
AppellantGaleforce, LLCPaula Ann Fleck
Susan Louise Combs
AppelleeThe Design Committee of the Homestead Subdivision, 2nd and 3rd FilingsJames Kent Lubing
Douglas Fitzgerald Schultz
AppelleeSandra DayJames Kent Lubing
Douglas Fitzgerald Schultz
AppelleeHorton SpitzerJames Kent Lubing
Douglas Fitzgerald Schultz
AppelleeGary FinkelJames Kent Lubing
Douglas Fitzgerald Schultz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2010 WY 51
Citation:230 P.3d 299 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/29/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/29/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Douglas F. Schultz to appear on behalf of AppelleesNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/14/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellants; and received copy of brief on disk.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' reply brief; and received copy of brief on cd.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paula Fleck for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James K. Lubing for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/30/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Attachments.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Paula Ann Fleck for appellants; James Kent Lubing for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/11/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/11/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/17/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/13/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal