judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOWELL (MARK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36379
Short Caption:HOWELL (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 40211
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5297Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11373
07/25/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Robert Witek shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. Thereafter, this appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 00-12831
09/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-15612
09/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-15613
09/22/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-16767
09/22/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-16769
10/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, " . . . the judgment of the district court is affirmed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-18112
11/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-18192
11/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 15, 2000. 00-18192