judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

M&M AUTO OUTLET, a Wyoming Corporation v. HILL INVESTMENT CORPORATION, a Colorado Corporation, d/b/a First Financial, Inc.

Case Heading (S-09-0160)
Case Number:S-09-0160Case Docketed On:08/14/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:M&M AUTO OUTLET, a Wyoming Corporation v. HILL INVESTMENT CORPORATION, a Colorado Corporation, d/b/a First Financial, Inc.
Full Title:M&M AUTO OUTLET, a Wyoming Corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. HILL INVESTMENT CORPORATION, a Colorado Corporation, d/b/a First Financial, Inc., Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantM&M Auto Outlet, A Wyoming corporationStephen R. Winship
AppelleeHill Investment Corporation, a Colorado CorporationRichard D. Bush
David F. Evans
John Anthony Coppede

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2010 WY 56
Citation:230 P.3d 1099 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/14/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/14/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/28/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/04/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard D. Bush for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Winship for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/16/2010Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
02/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Submit Case on Briefs and to Vacate Oral ArgumentsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/14/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/14/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/18/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/17/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal