judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DAVID A. TROUSDALE, JR. v. TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY

Case: A-4570
A-4570
03/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
DAVID A. TROUSDALE, JR.
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/02/1955Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/12/1954Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/08/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/30/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/26/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/08/1955Response to Motion filed
03/02/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/16/1955Dissenting opinion issued.
02/16/1955Opinion issued
06/12/1954Response to Brief filed
06/08/1954Brief on the Merits
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/12/1954Document received (See Remarks)
04/30/1954Reply to Response
03/26/1954Response to Petition
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas and New Orleans Railroad CompanyRespondent
David A. Trousdale, Jr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information