Case Information: 36378 | |||
Short Caption: | VELAS (MICHAEL) VS. WARDEN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C137944 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/05/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
07/05/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 00-11371 | |
07/05/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
07/19/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed 5/15/00 and Notice of Entry of Order filed 5/17/00. Due Date: 10 days | ||
07/31/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on May 15, 2000. | 00-13217 | |
07/31/2000 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Notice of Entry of Order filed in district court on May 17, 2000. | 00-13219 | |
12/13/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. | 00-21803 | |
12/29/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-22699 | |
01/11/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 01-00728 | |
01/23/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On January 11, 2001, the State filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. The motion to dismiss this appeal is denied. The State shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days of this order. | 01-01434 | |
02/09/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Fast Track Statement. | 01-02725 | |
03/05/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On February 9, 2001, the State filed a motion to strike the fast track statement. The motion to strike the fast track statement is denied. Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file an appendix that comports with the requirements of NRAP 3C, NRAP 30, and NRAP 32. The state shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response and appendix. | 01-03944 | |
04/05/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: April 11, 2001. | 01-05799 | |
04/05/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to Permit Late Filing of Appendix. | 01-05878 | |
04/12/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-06367 | |
04/12/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vols. I and II. | 01-06368 | |
04/17/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the appendix provisionally submitted on March 27, 2001. | 01-06533 | |
04/17/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-05403 | |
05/18/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP01A-MS/DA/RR | 01-08285 | |
06/13/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-08446 | |
06/13/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/05/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. | 01-08446 |