judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS MEXICAN RAILROAD COMPANY v. T. A. BUNN

Case: A-4569
A-4569
03/18/1954
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS MEXICAN RAILROAD COMPANY
T. A. BUNN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/21/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/29/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/15/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
04/12/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/01/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/23/1954Response to Motion filed
06/21/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/15/1954Response to Brief filed
04/12/1954Reply to Response
04/01/1954Response to Petition
03/22/1954Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
03/18/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/18/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. A. BunnRespondent
Texas Mexican Railroad CompanyPetitioner
John PeaceAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information